CA AB1664 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 262, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 262, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17462.3 and 17489 of the Education Code, relating to school facilities.
Title
School facilities: sale or lease of real property.
Sponsors
Asm. Curt Hagman [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1664 Hagman By Huff (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1664 HAGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1664 HAGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 262, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4366.). |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5172.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 17462.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 17489 | Amended Code | Citation Text |