CA AB1658 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 762, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 762, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10618.6 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.
Title
Foster care: consumer credit reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 1658 JONES-SAWYER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1658 Jones-Sawyer By Beall (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1658 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1658 Jones-Sawyer By Beall (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1658 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 762, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6098.). |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4467.). |
2014-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5243.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and B. & F. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1785.11.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10618.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16515 | New Code | See Bill Text |