CA AB1657 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 721, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 721, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 756 to, and to repeal Section 755 of, the Evidence Code, and to add Section 68092.1 to the Government Code, relating to courts.
Title
Courts: interpreters.
Sponsors
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] | Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 1657 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Special Consent #19 AB1657 Gomez By Correa (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1657 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Special Consent #19 AB1657 Gomez By Correa (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1657 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 721, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6646.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6658.). |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4901.). |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5022.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 755 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Evidence Code | 756 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 68092.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |