CA AB1633 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6027.5 to the Penal Code, relating to criminal law.
Title
The Board of State and Community Corrections.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2014-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 6027 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6027.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |