CA AB1624 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-15 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-15 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 379.6 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Self-generation incentive program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1624 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-15 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5325.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5339.) |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5219.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2014-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 379.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |