CA AB1623 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 85, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 85, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 5.3 (commencing with Section 13750) to Part 4 of the Penal Code, relating to family justice centers.
Title
Family justice centers.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Special Consent #17 AB1623 Atkins (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1623 ATKINS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1623 ATKINS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 85, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4146.). |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4641.) |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2014-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13750 | New Code | See Bill Text |