CA AB1617 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 303, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 303, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to state claims, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State claims.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1617 Gatto Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - AB 1617 GATTO Third Reading Urgency (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - AB 1617 GATTO Third Reading Urgency (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 303, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4656.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5845.). |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |