CA AB1612 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-15 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-15 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11344 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
State government: regulations.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Donnelly [R] | Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Asm. Diane Harkey [R] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Asm. Brian Nestande [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1612 Donnelly By Anderson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1612 DONNELLY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1612 DONNELLY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-15 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4410.). |
2014-08-07 | Senate | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5345.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11344 | Amended Code | Citation Text |