CA AB1596 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 596, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3006 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: vote by mail ballot applications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-11 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1596 Garcia By Correa (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - AB 1596 GARCIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 596, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2014-08-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2014-08-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2014-08-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4415.).
2014-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24).
2014-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2014-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4967.)
2014-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2014-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 6).
2014-02-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2014-02-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
2014-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code3006Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1596&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1551-1600/ab_1596_bill_20140204_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1551-1600/ab_1596_bill_20140813_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1551-1600/ab_1596_bill_20140926_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1551-1600/ab_1596_vote_20140506_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1551-1600/ab_1596_vote_20140515_1144AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1551-1600/ab_1596_vote_20140624_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1551-1600/ab_1596_vote_20140811_0353PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback