CA AB1595 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 409, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 409, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4433, 4433.5, 4474.1, 4478, 4520, 4521, 4525, 4530, 4535, 4540, 4544, 4550, 4552, 4561, 4562, 4564, 4565, 4626, 4628, 4629, 4635, 4640.6, 4646, 4646.5, 4648, 4649, 4650, 4659, 4662, 4669.2, 4677, 4685.8, 4701, 4702.6, 4705, 4775, 4830, 4831, 4832, and 4835 of, to amend the heading of Article 3 (commencing with Section 4530) of, to amend the heading of Article 6 (commencing with Section 4543) of, to amend the heading of Article 7 (commencing with Section 4550) of, Chapter 2 of Division 4.5 of, to add Sections 4520.5 and 4541 to, to repeal Sections 4543, 4547, 4560, and 4566 of, and to repeal and add Sections 4545, 4546, 4548, 4551, 4553, and 4563 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.
Title
State Council on Developmental Disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1595 CHESBRO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1595 Chesbro By Beall (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1595 CHESBRO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1595 Chesbro By Beall (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1595 CHESBRO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 409, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6550.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6559.). |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4856.). |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5110.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2014-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |