CA AB1592 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 1 (commencing with Section 104250) to Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 103 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to diabetes, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Diabetes Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Beth Gaines [R] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Asm. Paul Fong [D] |
Asm. Steve Fox [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Assembly - AB 1592 GAINES Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1592 Beth Gaines Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1592 GAINES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1592 Beth Gaines Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1592 GAINES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6444.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6469.). |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4817.). |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5325.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5344.) |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5220.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2014-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 104250 | New Code | See Bill Text |