CA AB1578 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-02 - In Assembly.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-02 - In Assembly.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 127660, 127662, 127664, and 127665 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Health: The California Health Benefit Review Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Richard Gordon [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 7 AB1578 Pan Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1578 PAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1578 PAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2014-08-30 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Page 5001.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5001.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Orde |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 5365.) |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Further hearing to be set. |
2014-03-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19137 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127660 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127662 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127664 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127665 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10373 | New Code | See Bill Text |