CA AB1556 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 316 of, and to add Sections 320.3, 1253.92, and 1326.5 to, the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Unemployment insurance.
Sponsors
Asm. Henry Perea [D] | Asm. Ian Calderon [D] | Asm. Jim Frazier [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Assembly - AB 1556 PEREA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1556 Perea By Hueso (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - AB 1556 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1556 Perea By Hueso (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - AB 1556 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 6272.). |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 4606.). |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 4471.) |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 9). |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1253.92 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1326.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 320.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |