CA AB155 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 865, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 865, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11.1 to the Monterey County Water Resources Agency Act (Chapter 1159 of the Statutes of 1990), relating to water.
Title
Monterey County Water Resources Agency: design-build.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 155 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB155 Alejo By Cannella (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 155 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB155 Alejo By Cannella (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 155 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 865, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6620.). |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27). |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6427.) |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4558.). |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-12 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 25). |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1809.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 22. Page 1838.) |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1728.) |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Alejo. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Alejo. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2013-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 226 | Amended Code | Citation Text |