CA AB1548 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 99152 and 99153 of, and to add and repeal Section 99160.7 of, the Education Code, relating to standardized tests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standardized tests: reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-04 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - AB 1548 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-14SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2014-08-04SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2014-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-07-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 25).
2014-06-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2014-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2014-06-05SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2014-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 12. Page 5103.)
2014-05-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 21).
2014-05-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2014-05-12AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2014-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (May 6).
2014-03-18AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2014-02-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2014-01-28AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 27.
2014-01-27AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1548&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1548_bill_20140127_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1548_bill_20140512_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1548_bill_20140618_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1548_bill_20140702_amended_sen_v96.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1548_vote_20140506_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1548_vote_20140521_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1548_vote_20140523_1035AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1548_vote_20140625_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1548_vote_20140804_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback