CA AB154 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 662, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2253 of, and to add Sections 2725.4 and 3502.4 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 123468 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-30 - AB 154 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB154 Atkins By Jackson (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - AB 154 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - AB 154 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading Amend By WALDRON Set #3 Motion to Lay on the Table By PEREZ, V.M (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 662, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2013-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 2765.).
2013-08-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-08-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 1976.).
2013-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 12).
2013-07-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-24SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 17).
2013-06-06SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
2013-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 1664.)
2013-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2013-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 23).
2013-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
2013-03-19AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2013-01-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
2013-01-22AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code2253Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2725.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code3502.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code734New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code123468Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_154&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_bill_20130122_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_bill_20130319_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_bill_20130430_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_bill_20130624_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_bill_20130122_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_bill_20130319_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_bill_20130430_amended_asm_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_bill_20130624_amended_sen_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_bill_20130905_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_bill_20131009_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_vote_20130409_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_vote_20130423_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_vote_20130524_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_vote_20130528_0121PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_vote_20130528_0153PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_vote_20130617_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_vote_20130703_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_vote_20130812_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_vote_20130826_0117PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_154_vote_20130830_0947AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback