CA AB1517 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Enrolled on August 26 2014 - 75% progress
Action: 2014-08-26 - Assembly Rule 77 suspended. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 680 of the Penal Code, relating to DNA evidence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DNA evidence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-26 - AB 1517 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1517 Skinner By De Le (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - AB 1517 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-26AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2014-08-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2014-08-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2014-08-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2014-08-04SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2014-06-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-05SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5235.)
2014-05-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) . Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2014-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2014-03-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-03-11AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-01-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-01-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
2014-01-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code680Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1517&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_bill_20140115_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_bill_20140523_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_bill_20140818_amended_sen_v97.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_vote_20140325_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_vote_20140523_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_vote_20140528_1134AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_vote_20140617_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_vote_20140804_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_vote_20140814_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_vote_20140822_1103AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_vote_20140826_0513PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback