CA AB1500 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-05-21 - In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 22963.5 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to electronic cigarettes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic cigarettes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-21 - Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2014-04-30 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-21AssemblyIn committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2014-05-07AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2014-04-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2014-03-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2014-01-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
2014-01-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code22963New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code22963.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code119406New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code30101.7Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback