CA AB1496 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-06-05 - Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to the Budget Act of 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2014.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-23 - AB 1496 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-05SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2014-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 5087.)
2014-05-08AssemblyWithout reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 19. Page 4818.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-01-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2014-01-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback