CA AB1478 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 5956.10 of the Government Code, to amend Section 50661 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 25416 and 31111.5 of, and to add Section 5080.43 to, the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 379.6 and 399.12 of the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Sections 62 and 193 of Chapter 35 of the Statutes of 2014, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1478 Committee on BUDGET (Skinner) By Leno (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1478 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By SKINNER (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1478 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1478 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By SKINNER (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1478 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6748.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 6751.). |
2014-08-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 5001.). |
2014-08-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 5000.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (August 14). |
2014-08-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 5078.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 19. Page 4818.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 5956.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50661 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25416 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 31111.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5080.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 379.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |