CA AB1476 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 663, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 663, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2014 (Chapter 25 of the Statutes of 2014) by amending Items 0555-001-0193, 0650-001-0001, 2660-001-0046, 3940-001-0193, 3980-001-0001, 3980-001-3056, 5180-001-0001, 5180-151-0001, 5227-101-3259, 5227-106-0001, 6110-111-0001, 6110-194-0001, 6110-195-0890, 6110-196-0001, 6110-488, 6440-001-0001, 6610-001-0001, 6870-101-0001, 7100-001-0514, 7100-001-0870, 8660-001-0462, 8660-001-0493, 8660-101-0493, 9800-001-0001, 9800-001-0494, and 9800-001-0988 of, by adding Items 0250-302-3138, 0690-001-3260, 3940-496, and 8660-011-0470 to, and by repealing Item 0650-001-3259 of, Section 2.00 of, and by amending Sections 11.00 and 39.00 of, that act, relating to the State Budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, Budget Bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2014.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1476 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By SKINNER (Y: 59 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 3 AB1476 Committee on BUDGET (Skinner) By Leno (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1476 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 3 AB1476 Committee on BUDGET (Skinner) By Leno (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1476 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 663, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor with item veto. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6734.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6734.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 6736.). |
2014-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (August 29). Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 4984.). |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4952.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (August 14). |
2014-08-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 5077.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 19. Page 4818.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |