CA AB1459 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 17224, 17250.30, and 81704 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 6204, 6531, 11270, 11544, 12153, 12168.7, 12224, 12225, 12227, 12228, 12229, 12230, 12231, 12232, 12233, 12236, 12432, 12478, 13300.5, 13332.11, 13332.19, 13963.1, 14740, 14745, 14746, 16429.1, 16731.6, 17090, 17091, 17093, 17094, 17095, 17096, 17097, 17617, 22802, 22910, 22910.5, and 22913 of, to add Section 20035.11 to, to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 12270) to Chapter 3 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to add Chapter 10 (commencing with Section 11850) to Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to repeal Sections 11548.5, 12234, 12235, and 26915 of, to repeal Article 3 (commencing with Section 14750), Article 4 (commencing with Section 14755), Article 6 (commencing with Section 14765), and Article 7 (commencing with Section 14769) of Chapter 5 of Part 5.5 of, and to repeal Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 15849.20) of Part 10b of, Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 50661, 51452, and 53545 of, and to repeal Sections 50840, 50841, and 50842 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 135, 1771.5, 1771.7, and 1776 of, to add Sections 1725.5, 1771.1, and 1771.4 to, and to repeal and add Sections 1771.3 and 1773.3 of, the Labor Code, to amend Section 179 of the Military and Veterans Code, to amend Sections 1485.5 and 13835.7 of the Penal Code, to amend Sections 20133, 20175.2, 20193, 20209.7, 20688.6, and 20919.3 of, and to repeal and add Sections 6823 and 6953 of, the Public Contract Code, and to repeal and add Sections 100152 and 103396 of the Public Utilities Code, to amend Section 75.70 of, and to add Section 95.5 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 1112, 1112.5, 1114, 1126, 1127, 1135, and 1585.5 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, and to amend Section 2 of Chapter 469 of the Statutes of 2002, relating to state and local government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State and local government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-15 - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - AB 1459 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-26SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett.
2014-06-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (June 15). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2014-06-09SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 3784.)
2014-06-05SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2014-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 5068.)
2014-05-08AssemblyWithout reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 19. Page 4818.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-01-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2014-01-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code17224Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code17250.30Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code81704Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11270Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11544Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11548.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code12153Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12168.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12224Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12225Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12227Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12228Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12229Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12230Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12231Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12232Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12233Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12234Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code12235Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code12236Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12432Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12478Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13300.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13332.11Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13332.19Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13963.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14740Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14745Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14746Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16429.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16731.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code17090Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code17091Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code17093Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code17094Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code17095Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code17096Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code17097Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code17617Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20035.11New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code22802Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22910Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22910.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22913Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code26915Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code6204Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6531Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50661Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50840Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50841Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50842Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code51452Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code53545Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code179Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code13835.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1485.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code100152New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Contract Code103396New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code20133Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code20175.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code20193Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code20209.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code20688.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code20919.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code6823New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code6953New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code75.70Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code95.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code1112Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code1112.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code1114Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code1126Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code1127Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code1135Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code1585.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code135Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1725.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1771.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1771.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1771.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1771.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1776Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback