CA AB1455 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 229, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 229, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 48900.9 to the Education Code, relating to pupils.
Title
Pupils: bullying: counseling services.
Sponsors
Asm. Nora Campos [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-07 - Assembly - AB 1455 CAMPOS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Senate - Special Consent #18 AB1455 Campos (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 1455 CAMPOS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Senate - Special Consent #18 AB1455 Campos (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 1455 CAMPOS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 229, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 5899.). |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4258.). |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 4594.) |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48900.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |