CA AB1439 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-9)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 592, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-9)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 592, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17539.1 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to sweepstakes.
Title
Unfair business practices: contests and sweepstakes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Assembly - AB 1439 SALAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1439 Salas By Correa (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1439 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1439 Salas By Correa (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1439 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 592, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6444.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6466.). |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4826.). |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5197.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and B.,P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17539.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |