CA AB1401 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Vetoed on October 7 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 203 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to jury duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jury duty: eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-22 - AB 1401 JUD. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1401 Committee on JUD. (Wieckowski) By De Le (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - AB 1401 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 45 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-06 Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
2014-01-06 Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2013-10-07 Vetoed by Governor.
2013-09-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2013-08-22AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 2663.).
2013-08-19AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-08-19SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 1880.).
2013-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25).
2013-06-10SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-06-05SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-05-09SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2013-04-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 26. Page 1116.)
2013-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 23).
2013-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-04-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2013-04-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2013-03-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 12.
2013-03-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure203Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1401&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1401-1450/ab_1401_bill_20130312_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1401-1450/ab_1401_bill_20130416_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1401-1450/ab_1401_bill_20130610_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1401-1450/ab_1401_bill_20130312_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1401-1450/ab_1401_bill_20130416_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1401-1450/ab_1401_bill_20130610_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1401-1450/ab_1401_bill_20130827_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1401-1450/ab_1401_vote_20130423_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1401-1450/ab_1401_vote_20130425_1034AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1401-1450/ab_1401_vote_20130625_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1401-1450/ab_1401_vote_20130819_0120PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1401-1450/ab_1401_vote_20130822_0952AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback