CA AB1327 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6254.31 to the Government Code, and to add Title 14 (commencing with Section 14350) to Part 4 of the Penal Code, relating to unmanned aircraft systems.
Title
Unmanned aircraft systems.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeff Gorell [R] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] |
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Asm. Steve Fox [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1327 GORELL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1327 Gorell By Lieu (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1327 GORELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1327 Gorell By Lieu (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1327 GORELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6550.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 4. Page 6558.). |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 4863.). |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 6. Page 3722.) |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1144.) Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 23). |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and L. GOV. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14350 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 6254.31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 14350 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 6254.31 | New Code | See Bill Text |