CA AB1313 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 69614.5 to the Government Code, relating to courts.
Title
Judgeships: allocation.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Donnelly [R] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] | Asm. Steve Fox [D] | Sen. Shannon Grove [R] |
Asm. Curt Hagman [R] | Asm. Diane Harkey [R] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Asm. Eric Linder [R] |
Sen. Mike Morrell [R] | Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] | Asm. Donald Wagner [R] | Sen. Bill Emmerson [R] |
Sen. Steve Knight [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation. |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 69614.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 77003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |