CA AB1268 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 337.01) to Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 1 of, and to repeal Sections 325.5 and 325.6 of, the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Unemployment insurance: veterans' unemployment: Veterans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1268 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1268 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | From special consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1706.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) . Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and V.A. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 325.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 325.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 337.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |