CA AB1266 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-08-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 85, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 221.5 of the Education Code, relating to pupil rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil rights: sex-segregated school programs and activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-07-03 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1266 Ammiano By Leno (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - AB 1266 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 85, Statutes of 2013.
2013-08-12 Approved by the Governor.
2013-08-01AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
2013-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2013-07-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 9. Page 1654.).
2013-06-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 12).
2013-05-23SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2013-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 25. Page 1321.)
2013-04-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 17).
2013-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2013-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2013-02-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2013-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code221.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1266&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1251-1300/ab_1266_bill_20130222_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1251-1300/ab_1266_bill_20130425_amended_asm_v98.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1251-1300/ab_1266_bill_20130425_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1251-1300/ab_1266_bill_20130710_enrolled.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1251-1300/ab_1266_bill_20130710_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1251-1300/ab_1266_bill_20130222_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1251-1300/ab_1266_bill_20130425_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1251-1300/ab_1266_bill_20130710_enrolled.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1251-1300/ab_1266_bill_20130812_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1251-1300/ab_1266_vote_20130417_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1251-1300/ab_1266_vote_20130509_1003AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1251-1300/ab_1266_vote_20130612_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1251-1300/ab_1266_vote_20130703_0246PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback