CA AB1263 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 13 (commencing with Section 3599.50) to Division 4 of Title 1 of the Government Code, and to add Article 4.6 (commencing with Section 14146) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: CommuniCal.
Sponsors
Asm. John Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1263 John A. P (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1263 PEREZ, J. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1263 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Employees, Retirement and Social Security (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1263 PEREZ, J. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1263 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Employees, Retirement and Social Security (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2014-01-06 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2013-10-13 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2013-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3227.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 3244.). |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 2331.). |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2013-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 3). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and HEALTH. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 1705.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) . Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 10). |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3599.50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14146 | New Code | See Bill Text |