CA AB125 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-30 - In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-30 - In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65962 of the Government Code, relating to water,and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Water: floods.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Dan Logue [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 7 AB125 Eggman Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 125 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 125 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2014-08-30 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 5002.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5006.). |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Walters. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 1729.) |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-01-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2013-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 22212.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65962 | Amended Code | Citation Text |