CA AB1217 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 790, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 790, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 13 (commencing with Section 1796.10) to Division 2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Home Care Services Consumer Protection Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Bonnie Lowenthal [D] | Asm. Anthony Rendon [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D] |
Sen. Curren Price [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1217 Lowenthal By De Le (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1217 LOWENTHAL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - From Committee: Amendments returned with further amendements to Senate floor for consideration (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1217 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1217 LOWENTHAL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - From Committee: Amendments returned with further amendements to Senate floor for consideration (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1217 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 790, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 3333.). |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2399.). |
2013-09-11 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned with further amendments to the Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (September 11). Ordered to third reading. Joint Rule 61(a)(13) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2376.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 2389.) |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 10). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2013-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 1796.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) . Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 30). |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1796.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |