CA AB110 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Consideration of Governor's item veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Consideration of Governor's item veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act making appropriations for the support of the government of the State of California and for several public purposes in accordance with the provisions of Section 12 of Article IV of the Constitution of the State of California, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-14 - Senate - Conference Reports AB110 Blumenfield By Leno (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Assembly - AB 110 BLUMENFIELD Conference Report (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 110 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 1 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB110 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 110 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Assembly - AB 110 BLUMENFIELD Conference Report (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 110 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 1 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB110 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 110 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | Consideration of Governor's item veto stricken from file. | |
2013-06-27 | Consideration of Governor's item veto pending. | |
2013-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 20, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-06-27 | Approved by the Governor with item veto. | |
2013-06-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Assembly adopts Conference Committee report. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 2005.). |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Senate adopted Conference Committee report. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1362.) |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | From printer. |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | From Conference Committee: Be adopted. Assembly (Ayes 3 (Blumenfield, Mitchell, and Skinner). Noes 1 (Gorell)). Senate (Ayes 3 (Leno, De Leon, and Hancock). Noes 1 (Emmerson)). To print. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. To Conference Committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 77. Page 1797.) In the Assembly: Joint Rules 28, 28.1, and 29 suspended. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 1780.) Assembly Members Blumenfield, Gorell, Mitchell and Skinner appointed to Conference Committee. (Page 1797.) In the Senate: Joint Rules 28, 28.1, and 29 suspended. (Page 1195.) Senators Leno, DeLeon, Hancock, and Emmers |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after May 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1147.). |
2013-05-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1119.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1407.) |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1312.) Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1313.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1315.) |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |