CA AB1089 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 761, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 761, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 95014 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 4643.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.
Title
Foster care.
Sponsors
Asm. Ian Calderon [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] | Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Assembly - AB 1089 CALDERON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1089 Ian Calderon By Beall (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1089 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1089 Ian Calderon By Beall (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1089 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 761, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6271.). |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4615.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-05-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1595.) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 56426.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 95014 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 123105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 123110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4514 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4643.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4726 | Amended Code | Citation Text |