CA AB1068 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progress
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 9024 to the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Petitions: signature gathering.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-08-27 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1068 Saldana By DeSaulnier (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - AB 1068 SALDANA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-05 - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-14 Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2009-10-26 Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2009-10-11 Vetoed by Governor.
2009-09-02 Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
2009-08-27 In Assembly. To enrollment.
2009-08-27 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1966.)
2009-07-09 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-07-08 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 7).
2009-06-18 Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
2009-06-02 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-06-01 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 1864.)
2009-05-06 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-05-05 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 5).
2009-03-26 Referred to Com. on E. & R.
2009-03-02 Read first time.
2009-03-01 From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
2009-02-27 Introduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback