CA AB1043 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 75101 of the Public Resources Code, relating to groundwater.
Title
Safe Drinking Water, Water Quality and Supply, Flood
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 1043 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1043 Chau By Hernandez (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1043 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1043 Chau By Hernandez (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1043 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6616.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6628.). |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4889.). |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1697.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 75101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 75101.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 75101.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |