CA AB1006 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 269, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 781 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juvenile court records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile court records: sealing and destruction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-22 - AB 1006 YAMADA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1006 Yamada By Torres (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - AB 1006 YAMADA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 269, Statutes of 2013.
2013-09-09 Approved by the Governor.
2013-08-29AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2013-08-22AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2656.).
2013-08-19AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-08-19SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 1878.).
2013-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-06-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 24).
2013-06-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-05-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-04-25SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-04-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-04-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 920.)
2013-04-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2013-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2013-02-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2013-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code781Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1006&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1006_bill_20130222_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1006_bill_20130508_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1006_bill_20130222_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1006_bill_20130508_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1006_bill_20130827_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1006_bill_20130909_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1006_vote_20130402_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1006_vote_20130410_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1006_vote_20130415_0143PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1006_vote_20130604_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1006_vote_20130624_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1006_vote_20130819_0107PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1006_vote_20130822_0936AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback