CA AB10 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 25 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1182.12 of the Labor Code, relating to wages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum wage: annual adjustment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-12 - AB 10 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly 3rd Supp 2 AB10 Alejo By Monning (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - AB 10 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2013.
2013-09-25 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
2013-09-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3353.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 3355.).
2013-09-12SenateWithdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 2407.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2412.).
2013-09-11SenateSenate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 5. Page 2341.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-08-12SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2013-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) . Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2013-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2013-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 27. Page 1806.)
2013-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-01-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2012-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2012-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code1182.12Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_10&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_10_bill_20121203_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_10_bill_20130619_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_10_bill_20121203_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_10_bill_20130619_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_10_bill_20130911_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_10_bill_20130916_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_10_bill_20130925_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_10_vote_20130424_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_10_vote_20130524_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_10_vote_20130530_1246PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_10_vote_20130626_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_10_vote_20130812_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_10_vote_20130830_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_10_vote_20130912_0414PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_10_vote_20130912_0743PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback