AZ SR1007 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on February 21 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-02-21 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

PANDAS; PITAND; PANS; awareness day

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PANDAS; PITAND; PANS; awareness day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-21 Transmitted to Secretary Of State
2014-02-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2014-02-11SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-11SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-10SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2014-01-30SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-02-05SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2014-02-03SenateReferred to Senate HHS Committee
2014-02-03SenateSenate read second time
2014-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2014-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback