AZ SB1362 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Optometrists; pharmaceutical agents
Title
Optometrists; pharmaceutical agents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 1 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (1-7-0-0-0) |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2014-03-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-6-1-0) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |