AZ SB1302 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tax credit; food bank organizations
Title
Tax credit; food bank organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |