AZ SB1238 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-26 - Referred to House GOV Committee
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-26 - Referred to House GOV Committee
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic records; state library
Title
Electronic records; state library
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to House GOV Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-25 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2014-02-25 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |