AZ SB1199 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - Referred to House ED Committee
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - Referred to House ED Committee
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School board members; school employment
Title
School board members; school employment
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2014-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |