AZ SB1180 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Chapter 110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Chapter 110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Luxury privilege tax; cider; definition
Title
Luxury privilege tax; cider; definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Chapter 110 | |
2014-04-22 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-15 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0) |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |