AZ SB1163 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Technical correction; child hearing programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technical correction; child hearing programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-05 Governor Signed
2012-04-04 Transmitted to Governor
2012-04-02 Transmit to Senate
2012-04-02 House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2012-03-22 House Consent Calendar March 22, 2012 @ 2:51 PM
2012-03-22 House majority caucus: Do pass
2012-03-22 House minority caucus: Do pass
2012-03-22 House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2012-03-12 Referred to House RULES Committee
2012-03-15 House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0)
2012-03-13 Referred to House TRANS Committee
2012-03-13 House read second time
2012-03-12 Assigned to House RULES Committee
2012-03-12 Assigned to House TRANS Committee
2012-03-12 Introduced in House and read first time
2012-03-08 Transmit to House
2012-03-08 Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
2012-03-06 Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2012-03-01 Senate majority caucus: Do pass
2012-03-01 Senate minority caucus: Do pass
2012-03-01 Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended
2012-01-18 Referred to Senate RULES Committee
2012-02-21 Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-2-1-0)
2012-02-20 Referred to Senate APPROP Committee
2012-02-28 Senate GR Committee action: Withdrawn
2012-01-19 Referred to Senate GR Committee
2012-01-19 Senate read second time
2012-01-18 Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
2012-02-20 Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2012-02-14 Assigned to Senate GR Committee
2012-01-18 Introduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback