AZ SB1124 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Chapter 106
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Chapter 106
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Controlled substances prescription monitoring program
Title
Controlled substances prescription monitoring program
Sponsors
Sen. Kelli Ward [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. Edward Ableser [D] |
Sen. David Bradley [D] | Rep. David Livingston [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Chapter 106 | |
2014-04-22 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-15 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-25 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |