AZ SB1118 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Chapter 182
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Chapter 182
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Hunting on private land; trespassing
Title
Hunting on private land; trespassing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Chapter 182 | |
2014-04-23 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-21 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-17 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-1-3-0) |
2014-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | House PSMRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) |
2014-02-24 | House | Referred to House PSMRA Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | Assigned to House PSMRA Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate NRRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate NRRA Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRRA Committee |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |