AZ SB1062 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Note: Replaces legislation HB2153

Status

Status: Vetoed on February 26 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-02-26 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Exercise of religion; state action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exercise of religion; state action.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-16 - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-26 Governor Vetoed
2014-02-24 Transmitted to Governor
2014-02-20HouseTransmit to Senate
2014-02-20HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (33-27-0-0)
2014-02-19SenateTransmit to House
2014-02-19SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2014-02-19SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2014-01-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-01-28SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-01-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2014-01-14SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-01-16SenateSenate GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0)
2014-01-15SenateReferred to Senate GE Committee
2014-01-15SenateSenate read second time
2014-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate GE Committee
2014-01-14SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2153 (Replaces) 2014-02-20 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback