AZ SB1062 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-27 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-27 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Adoption subsidy; behavioral health services
Title
Adoption subsidy; behavioral health services
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-0-0-0-0) |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2013-03-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |