AZ SB1047 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Chapter 216
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Chapter 216
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Closing protection letters; escrow agents
Title
Closing protection letters; escrow agents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Financial Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Financial Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Chapter 216 | |
2014-04-24 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-23 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-22 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2014-03-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | House FI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2014-02-24 | House | Referred to House FI Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | Assigned to House FI Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |